Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/02/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2009