Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/18/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/24/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/26/2010