Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/09/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/24/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/13/2009