Refine your search

Showing 4 of 4 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/10/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7372)
07/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 410 - 8, 2 Present (Roll no. 515).(text: CR 7/7/2009 H7721)
06/12/2009 Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-152.
05/20/2009 Introduced in House