Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/15/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/04/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/04/2010