Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/03/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/03/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/24/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/24/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/24/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/14/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/14/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/02/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/2009