Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/09/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/17/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/15/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/31/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/24/2010