Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/12/2010