Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/21/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/22/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/30/2009