Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/18/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/07/2009