Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/17/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/19/2010