There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of an Early Detection Month for breast cancer and all forms of cancer.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
02/23/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
02/23/2010Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S714)
01/21/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 1/20/2010 H204)
06/25/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
02/24/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/23/2010SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
02/23/2010SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S714)
01/22/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
01/21/2010-1:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/21/2010-1:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 1/20/2010 H204)
01/21/2010-1:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H301)
01/20/2010-11:27amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lynch objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
01/20/2010-11:12amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 158.
01/20/2010-11:12amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H204-206)
01/20/2010-11:12amHouseMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
12/10/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
12/10/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/25/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/25/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/07/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/09/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/25/2009 Referred to
12/10/2009 Markup by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/22/2010 Referred to
02/23/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/23/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on January 21, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the designation of an Early Detection Month to enhance public awareness of cancer screening.