Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/12/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/23/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/23/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/26/2010