Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/21/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/30/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/31/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/30/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/22/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/17/2009