Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/13/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/16/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/22/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/23/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/24/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2009