Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/23/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/01/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/03/2009