Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/28/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/29/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/07/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/18/2010