Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/24/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/25/2010