Summary: H.Con.Res.172 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/31/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, July 31, 2009, Saturday, August 1, 2009, or Sunday, August 2, 2009, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, September 8, 2009.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, August 6, 2009, through Tuesday, August 11, 2009, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Tuesday, September 8, 2009.