There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury as the leading cause of death and disability in the United States for children and young adults from birth until 25 years of age and endorsing the National Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury Plan to develop a seamless, standardized, evidence-based system of care universally accessible for all of these children, young adults, and their families, regardless of where they live in the country.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/13/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/14/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/13/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/13/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (110)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/03/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/03/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/04/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/18/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/27/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/27/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/13/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/14/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.198.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.198. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/13/2009)

Recognizes Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury (PABI) as the leading cause of death and disability in the United States for children and young adults from birth until 25 years of age.

Endorses the National Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury Plan and encourages its implementation by federal, state, and local governments.