Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/03/2010