Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2010