Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/27/2010