Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2010