Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/29/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/02/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 11/02/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/04/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/19/2009