Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/12/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/12/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/18/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/18/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/20/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/06/2010