There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage crisis, during which 52 United States citizens were held hostage for 444 days from November 4, 1979, to January 20, 1981, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 11/6/2009 H12546-12547)
11/05/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/09/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/07/2009-11:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2009-11:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 11/6/2009 H12546-12547)
11/07/2009-11:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12969)
11/06/2009-6:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McMahon objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
11/06/2009-6:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 209.
11/06/2009-6:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12546-12549)
11/06/2009-6:24pmHouseMr. McMahon moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
11/05/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
11/05/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs11/05/2009 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations11/09/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.209.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.209. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/07/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage crisis during which 52 U.S. citizens were held hostage for 444 days.

Honors the service of the U.S. diplomats and military personnel held hostage and the servicemen who were killed or wounded in an attempt to free the hostages.

Supports all Iranian citizens who embrace the values of freedom, human rights, civil liberties, and rule of law.

Urges the Secretary of State to make every effort to assist U.S. citizens held hostage in Iran at any time during the period beginning November 4, 1979, through January 20, 1981, and their survivors in matters of detention-related compensation.