Text: H.Con.Res.209 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/09/2009)

 
[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 209 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

111th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 209


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            November 9, 2009

      Received and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
Recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage crisis, during 
  which 52 United States citizens were held hostage for 444 days from 
     November 4, 1979, to January 20, 1981, and for other purposes.

Whereas, in the face of internal political upheaval in Iran, the United States 
        Government maintained a diplomatic presence in Tehran following the fall 
        of Shah Mohammed Reza Pahlavi in January 1979, and sought to engage the 
        new provisional government of Prime Minister Mehdi Bazargan;
Whereas, on November 4, 1979, Iranian militants scaled the walls of the United 
        States Embassy in Tehran and took 63 United States citizens and 
        diplomats hostage;
Whereas three more United States citizens were taken prisoner at the Iranian 
        Foreign Ministry, for a total of 66 hostages;
Whereas the occupiers bound and blindfolded the embassy staff and military 
        personnel and paraded them in front of photographers;
Whereas a total of 52 United States citizens were held hostage for 444 days 
        until January 20, 1981, in isolated and under psychologically 
        intimidating and onerous conditions;
Whereas Iranian militants violated the principle of diplomatic immunity and 
        United States sovereignty;
Whereas Ayatollah Khomeini endorsed the seizure of the United States Embassy and 
        detention of United States hostages and toppled the Bazargan government, 
        instructing that no Iranian officials hold discussions with United 
        States representatives;
Whereas the Soviet Union vetoed United States initiatives at the United Nations 
        Security Council to impose collective economic sanctions on Iran;
Whereas the United States broke off diplomatic relations with Iran on April 7, 
        1980, following unsuccessful diplomatic efforts to free the hostages;
Whereas, on April 24, 1980, the United States launched Operation Eagle Claw, a 
        high-risk rescue operation to free the hostages;
Whereas the rescue mission was aborted when three helicopters malfunctioned;
Whereas the following United States military personnel from the all-volunteer 
        Joint Special Operations Group lost their lives and three more were 
        injured in the Great Salt Desert near Tabas, Iran, on April 25, 1980, in 
        the aborted attempt to rescue the United States hostages--

    (1) Capt. Richard L. Bakke, 34, Long Beach, CA, Air Force;

    (2) Sgt. John D. Harvey, 21, Roanoke, VA, Marine Corps;

    (3) Cpl. George N. Holmes, Jr., 22 Pine Bluff, AR, Marine Corps;

    (4) Staff Sgt. Dewey L. Johnson, 32, Jacksonville, NC, Marine Corps;

    (5) Capt. Harold L. Lewis, 35, Mansfield, CT, Air Force;

    (6) Tech. Sgt. Joel C. Mayo, 34, Bonifay, FL, Air Force;

    (7) Capt. Lynn D. McIntosh, 33, Valdosta, GA, Air Force; and

    (8) Capt. Charles T. McMillan II, 28, Corrytown, TN, Air Force;

Whereas the Algerian Government brokered a January 19, 1981, agreement between 
        Iran and the United States, to which the United States agreed, under 
        duress, resulting in the release of the hostages on January 20, 1981;
Whereas President Reagan asked former President Carter to welcome the released 
        hostages at Rhein-Mein Air Base; and
Whereas the Iranian Government's commemoration of the 30th anniversary of the 
        Iranian hostage crisis was met with street protests against the 
        repressive Iranian regime: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) recognizes the 30th anniversary of the Iranian hostage 
        crisis, during which 52 United States citizens were held 
        hostage for 444 days;
            (2) honors the sacrifice and service of the United States 
        diplomats and military personnel held hostage and servicemen 
        who lost their lives and were wounded in a valiant attempt to 
        free the United States hostages;
            (3) in recognition of this sacrifice, hopes that the people 
        of the United States and Iran may embark on a new relationship 
        that fully reflects their most noble aspirations for life and 
        liberty;
            (4) expresses its support for all Iranian citizens who 
        embrace the values of freedom, human rights, civil liberties, 
        and rule of law; and
            (5) urges the Secretary of State to make every effort to 
        assist United States citizens held hostage in Iran at any time 
        during the period beginning on November 4, 1979, and ending on 
        January 20, 1981, and their survivors in matters of 
        compensation related to such citizens' detention.

            Passed the House of Representatives November 7, 2009.

            Attest:

                                            LORRAINE C. MILLER,

                                                                 Clerk.

Share This