Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2009