Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/24/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, December 16, 2009, through Saturday, January 2, 2010, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the Senate adjourns on any day from Friday, December 18, 2009, through Saturday, January 2, 2010, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day of the second session of the 111th Congress from Tuesday, January 5, 2010, through Saturday, January 9, 2010, it shall stand adjourned until noon on Tuesday, January 12, 2010.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day of the second session of the 111th Congress from Tuesday, January 5, 2010, through Saturday, January 9, 2010, it shall stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Tuesday, January 19, 2010.