There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One Hundred Eleventh Congress.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/24/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14140; text: CR S14140)
12/16/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 195 (Roll no. 978).(text: CR H14991)
12/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
12/24/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/24/2009SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14140; text: CR S14140)
12/16/2009SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/16/2009-10:37amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2009-10:37amHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 195 (Roll no. 978). (text: CR H14991)
12/16/2009-10:05amHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H14991-14992)
12/16/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 06/23/2018 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.223 - Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One Hundred Eleventh Congress.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.223.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/24/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Wednesday, December 16, 2009, through Saturday, January 2, 2010, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the Senate adjourns on any day from Friday, December 18, 2009, through Saturday, January 2, 2010, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day of the second session of the 111th Congress from Tuesday, January 5, 2010, through Saturday, January 9, 2010, it shall stand adjourned until noon on Tuesday, January 12, 2010.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day of the second session of the 111th Congress from Tuesday, January 5, 2010, through Saturday, January 9, 2010, it shall stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Tuesday, January 19, 2010.