Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/11/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Tuesday, February 9, 2010, through Saturday, February 13, 2010, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Monday, February 22, 2010.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Wednesday, February 10, 2010, through Sunday, February 14, 2010, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, February 22, 2010.