Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/25/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/13/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/13/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/15/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/20/2010