Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/03/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/03/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/03/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/03/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/03/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/03/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/09/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/14/2010