Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/03/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/03/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/03/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/03/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/03/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/15/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/15/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/15/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/16/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 03/19/2010