Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/24/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2010