There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/07/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3433)
05/05/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3170)
05/04/2010Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-471.
03/04/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/07/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/07/2010SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433)
05/06/2010SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/05/2010-3:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/05/2010-3:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3170)
05/05/2010-2:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 247.
05/05/2010-2:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3170-3171)
05/05/2010-2:56pmHouseMs. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/04/2010HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 189.
05/04/2010HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-471.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/29/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/29/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/29/2010HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/05/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/04/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/04/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/04/2010 Referred to
04/29/2010 Markup by
05/04/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-471
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/05/2010 Referred to
04/29/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.247. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/07/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Permits the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby Association to sponsor soap box derby races as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on June 19, 2010.