There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the Commandant of the Coast Guard and the Superintendent of the Coast Guard Academy and its staff for 100 years of operation of the Coast Guard Academy in New London, Connecticut, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/27/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6071)
07/15/2010Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-541.
03/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/28/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/27/2010-11:57amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2010-11:57amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6071)
07/27/2010-11:35amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 258.
07/27/2010-11:35amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6071-6074)
07/27/2010-11:35amHouseMr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
07/15/2010HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
07/15/2010HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-541.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/01/2010HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/01/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/01/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/26/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/25/2010HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/25/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/25/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Markup by
07/15/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-541
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation03/26/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/28/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/27/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Congratulates the Commandant of the Coast Guard and the Superintendent of the Coast Guard Academy and its staff for 100 years of operation of the Coast Guard Academy in New London, Connecticut.