Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/09/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/24/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/29/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/30/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/10/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010