Text: H.Con.Res.260 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/13/2010)

2d Session
H. CON. RES. 260

Recognizing the 62nd anniversary of the independence of the State of Israel, and reaffirming unequivocal support for the alliance and friendship between the United States and Israel.

April 13, 2010

Ms. Ros-Lehtinen (for herself, Mr. Klein of Florida, Mr. Boehner, Mr. Moore of Kansas, Mr. Cantor, Mr. Towns, Mr. Pence, Mr. Rothman of New Jersey, Mr. Burton of Indiana, Mr. Peters, Mr. Hoekstra, Ms. Corrine Brown of Florida, Mr. King of New York, Mr. Himes, Mr. McKeon, Mr. Adler of New Jersey, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mr. Patrick J. Murphy of Pennsylvania, Mr. Garrett of New Jersey, Ms. Richardson, Mr. Price of Georgia, Mr. Ellsworth, Mr. Mario Diaz-Balart of Florida, and Ms. Wasserman Schultz) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


Recognizing the 62nd anniversary of the independence of the State of Israel, and reaffirming unequivocal support for the alliance and friendship between the United States and Israel.

Whereas, on May 14, 1948, the State of Israel declared its independence;

Whereas Israel has provided Jews from all over the world with the opportunity to reestablish and participate in a Jewish state and society in their ancient homeland, the Land of Israel, with the city of Jerusalem as its undivided capital;

Whereas Israel is home to many religious sites sacred to Judaism, Christianity, and Islam;

Whereas Israel has provided a refuge to Jews who survived the unprecedented horrors of the Holocaust;

Whereas Israel has also provided a refuge to, and has successfully absorbed, more than 800,000 Jewish refugees who fled persecution in neighboring countries in the Middle East;

Whereas the people of Israel have established a pluralistic democracy that incorporates the freedoms cherished by the people of the United States, including freedom of speech, freedom of religion, freedom of association, freedom of the press, and government by the consent of the governed;

Whereas Israel continues to serve as a shining model of democratic values by regularly holding free and fair elections, promoting the free exchange of ideas, and vigorously exercising in its Parliament, the Knesset, a democratic government that is fully representative of its citizens;

Whereas Israel has bravely defended itself from repeated military and terrorist attacks since it declared its independence;

Whereas the thousands of rocket attacks from violent extremist groups in Gaza against Israeli civilian targets in recent years have caused hundreds of casualties and have destroyed homes, schools, buildings, roads, power lines, and other significant infrastructure;

Whereas several Israeli soldiers, including Staff Sgt. Gilad Shalit, continue to be held hostage by violent militant groups;

Whereas Israel has signed landmark peace treaties and successfully established peaceful bilateral relations with neighboring Egypt and Jordan;

Whereas despite the deaths of over 1,000 innocent Israelis over the last several years at the hands of murderous homicide bombers and other violent militants, the people of Israel continue to seek peace with their Palestinian neighbors;

Whereas successive Israeli governments, including the present one, have demonstrated through both words and specific actions that Israel is committed to the United States-Israel relationship and to the peace process;

Whereas the present Government of Israel, for the sake of peace, has made concessions which Secretary of State Hillary Rodham Clinton, on October 31, 2009, described as “unprecedented”;

Whereas President Barack Obama, on June 4, 2008, stated that “Jerusalem will remain the capital of Israel and it must remain undivided.”;

Whereas the Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 (PL 104–45) states that it is the policy of the United States that “Jerusalem should remain an undivided city in which the rights of every ethnic and religious group are protected” and that “Jerusalem should be recognized as the capital of the State of Israel”;

Whereas Israeli Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu, on March 22, 2010, stated that “The connection between the Jewish people and the Land of Israel cannot be denied. The connection between the Jewish people and Jerusalem cannot be denied … Jerusalem is not a settlement. It is our capital.”;

Whereas Vice President Joe Biden, speaking in Jerusalem on March 9, 2010, stated that “ … progress occurs in the Middle East when everyone knows there is simply no space between the United States and Israel.”;

Whereas Secretary of State Hillary Rodham Clinton, on March 22, 2010, stated that “This Administration will always stand up for Israel’s right to defend itself. And for Israel, there is no greater strategic threat than the prospect of a nuclear-armed Iran.”;

Whereas the Government of Iran, which rejects Israel's right to exist, is a continued threat to Israel's safety and security, both through its sponsorship of Foreign Terrorist Organizations like Hamas and Hezbollah and through its ongoing efforts to acquire nuclear weapons and the missiles to deliver them;

Whereas the United States and Israel enjoy a longstanding strategic partnership and friendship based on shared interests, democratic values, amity, and respect, and that include educational, scientific, technological, intelligence, military, and homeland security cooperation;

Whereas the people of the United States share a deep affinity with the people of Israel and view Israel as a strong and trusted ally;

Whereas the United States was one of the first nations to recognize the State of Israel, only 11 minutes after its creation; and

Whereas Israel's Independence Day on the Jewish calendar coincides this year with April 20, 2010: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That Congress—

(1) recognizes the significance of the 62nd anniversary of the establishment of the State of Israel as a place of refuge and national homeland for the Jewish people;

(2) reaffirms its enduring, bipartisan support for the alliance and friendship between the Governments and peoples of the United States and Israel, for Israel’s security and right to exist as a democratic, Jewish state, and for its right to defend itself;

(3) commends the people of Israel for their remarkable achievements, in the face of adversity, during the past 62 years; and

(4) extends warm congratulations and best wishes to the people of Israel as they celebrate the 62nd anniversary of Israel's independence.