Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/16/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/16/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/16/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/16/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/26/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/2010