Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/26/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/28/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/16/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/30/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/07/2010