Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/29/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/29/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/29/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/18/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2010