Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/05/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/06/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/06/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/14/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 08/10/2010