Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/06/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/06/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/06/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/12/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/12/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/09/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/09/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/09/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/09/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/17/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/17/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/24/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2010