Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/05/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2010