Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/08/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/10/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/14/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/23/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/23/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/30/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/30/2010