There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing Associated Builders and Contractors on the occasion of the 60th anniversary of its founding and for the many vital contributions merit shop commercial, industrial, and infrastructure construction contractors make to the quality of life of the people of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/14/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/14/2010Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/14/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/14/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/14/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/16/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/28/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/15/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/20/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/14/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.287.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.287. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/14/2010)

Recognizes the 60th anniversary of Associated Builders and Contractors.

Encourages Associated Builders and Contractors to continue its 60-year commitment to representing the merit shop construction industry.