Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/14/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/14/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/16/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/16/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/28/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/13/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/15/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/20/2010