Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/13/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/13/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/20/2010